SARRATT AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1139443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 June 2017 On time Download