SARRATT AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1139443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £42.24k £33.12k £32.64k £32.59k £8.52k
Total expenditure £40.98k £32.19k £31.56k £32.24k £6.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A