Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LAWRENCE'S, HATFIELD
Charity number: 1127942
Charity reporting is up to date (133 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Beadle | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy George Beadle | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Barbara Young | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Duncan Deakins | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Johnson | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Green | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Blair | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Glenys Helen Mashford | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dianne Fox | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Rosh Milner | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
VIVIENNE STUBBS | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Rashid | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ANNE GERALDINE RENDER | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|||||
VERA MARY OWEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISSY GRINDLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS GILL SALTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY ALAN RAPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL ADAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.