BECKENHAM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1138006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham George McLeod Trustee 01 September 2012 None on record
SHEILA ANN PRIESTMAN Trustee None on record
Jozef Paul Krywko Trustee 01 September 2016
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
COLIN WILSON Trustee None on record
Papa Boateng Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
ANN BARBARA FOX Trustee 01 September 2016
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
BROMLEY METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Mary Elizabeth Christina Jackson Trustee
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
SOUTH LONDON SINGERS Received: 21 days late
IRENE MARIONETTE Antwi Trustee
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
Ruben Enrique Martin Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Faustina Eshun Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Victoria Sarah Bessant Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
KWADJO ASAMOAH-KRODUA Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
COMFORT AYORKOR LAWSON Trustee None on record
Judith Anne Reep Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Andrew Cloke Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Gordon Leslie Hughes Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
IRENE LUM NTUMAZAH Trustee None on record
BARBARA KYEI Trustee
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
CHRISTINE HANDEL Trustee None on record
Rev Alexandra Terrett Chair 01 September 2018
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
CYNTHIA CAMPBELL Trustee None on record
Simon James Young Trustee 15 June 2012
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
JOHN DAVID DINGLEY Trustee None on record
Theophilus Farmer Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
DAVID EWART JACKSON Trustee 15 June 2012
SOUTH LONDON SINGERS Received: 21 days late
JENNIFER MARGARET NICHOLS Trustee
METHODIST CHURCH BROMLEY CIRCUIT Received: On time
CAROL LINDA JEFFERIES Trustee 01 September 2015
SOUTH LONDON SINGERS Received: 21 days late