BECKENHAM METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1138006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 August 2020 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 August 2020 55 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 November 2018 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 04 November 2018 127 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download