THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.AUGUSTINES, GILLINGHAM, KENT

Charity number: 1128481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £63.23k £85.65k £73.19k £82.97k £90.63k
Total expenditure £99.18k £58.17k £63.96k £86.43k £102.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £400
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £800 £1.10k