THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.AUGUSTINES, GILLINGHAM, KENT

Charity number: 1128481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David John Hodges Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Lesley Patricia Broughton Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Andrew Patrick Gray Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Martin Harris Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
PAUL ANTHONY PHILLIPS Trustee 03 July 2012 None on record
Trudie Jane Rhodes Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Sarah Lynsey Underhill Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Rev Amanda Jane Maskell Trustee 16 February 2021 None on record
Sheila Kathleen McSherry Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Dr PETER WILLIAM WAREING Trustee None on record
Penelope Ann Cadman Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record