THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGH WYCOMBE ST ANDREW

Charity number: 1128971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marion Lyon Trustee 28 April 2019
HIGH WYCOMBE AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Rev Simon Russell Trustee 12 July 2021 None on record
Sandra Williams Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Kevin Joseph Sarsfield Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Giorgio Manzin Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
John-Mark Cheffy Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Alice Nichols Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
David Charles Chapman Trustee 28 April 2019
MAPD - MAKING A POSITIVE DIFFERENCE Recently registered
Michelle da Rocha Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
Rev Anthony James Dixon Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
REV SIMON PHILIP DUST Chair None on record
David John Holland Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Richard Gravina Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Simon Jones Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Bryn Gosney Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Charles Vernon Trustee 27 April 2014
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FURNITURE MAKERS' CHARITABLE FUNDS INCORPORATING THE FURNISHING TRADES BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Neil Michael Hart Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Donna Clark Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record