Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYLEBONE WITH HOLY TRINITY ST MARYLEBONE
Charity number: 1129435
Charity reporting is up to date (64 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beth Kostick | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Hine | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Frances Smith Endres | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
REV CANON STEPHEN JOHN EVANS | Trustee | 08 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
MRS BRENDA ELISE ORMEROD | Trustee | 07 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
Michael Chukwuemeka ONA | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.