THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUR LADY OF ST MARY, BLOXHAM

Charity number: 1129237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.29k £89.29k £257.12k £87.01k £124.80k
Total expenditure £86.12k £86.12k £106.11k £131.12k £127.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £1.00k £1.00k N/A £2.26k