Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUR LADY OF ST MARY, BLOXHAM
Charity number: 1129237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dale Gingrich | Chair | 11 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
David Stanley Odell | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David John Gordon | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Catherine Hegarty | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen Thomas Craggs | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Perkin Ball | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Elizabeth Ogilvy | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Walklate | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
LYNN BRODEY | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Carlton | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MRS Elizebeth Farmer | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.