THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUR LADY OF ST MARY, BLOXHAM

Charity number: 1129237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 December 2020 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 December 2020 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 May 2019 205 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 May 2019 205 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time Download