Financial history BOLTON METHODIST MISSION

Charity number: 1130745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £186.59k £214.79k £204.33k £190.26k £234.87k
Total expenditure £197.04k £215.81k £160.26k £189.95k £203.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £6.40k £51.56k