ELM HALL DRIVE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1130115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £138.90k £131.48k £86.76k £145.50k £155.31k
Total expenditure £139.22k £124.90k £145.60k £139.37k £169.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £250 N/A