BEIS BRUCHA LTD

Charity number: 1131109
Charity reporting is up to date (60 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £554.37k £599.59k £647.20k £596.72k £573.14k
Total expenditure £557.73k £589.85k £597.14k £617.68k £665.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.25k £2.00k £5.00k £5.00k £4.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £403.94k £454.58k £533.40k £460.26k £443.19k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £149.20k £143.42k £111.77k £135.22k £128.83k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £2 £16 £8 £10
Income - Other £1.23k £1.59k £2.02k £1.23k £1.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £550.78k £571.64k £595.35k £612.79k £665.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.95k £18.21k £1.79k £4.89k £426
Expenditure - Governance £2.88k £2.75k £2.84k £3.33k £3.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0