Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SAVIOUR'S SUNBURY

Charity number: 1130267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jessica Anne Bray Chair 25 October 2020
None on record
Lynnette Peckett Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Sophie Raeside Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Douglas Neil Alexander Potkin Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Geraint Owen Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Guy Trevithick Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Lisa Annette Cook Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Keith Adrian Willsher Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Gillian Mary Harrap Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Christine Rogers Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Simon Greatwood Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Rani Banga Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Stephen Pal-George Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Bradford John Loader Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Rev Allen Cleeve Bower Trustee 25 October 2020
None on record
Hannah Clare Welch Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
Norman William Head Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
Lavinia Ann Trafford Bamford Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Barbie Ryder-Matthews Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record