TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH LOWESTOFT

Charity number: 1130417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

32 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
B Joan Porter Trustee 08 October 2017 None on record
Katy Butcher Trustee 01 June 2015 None on record
TREVOR JOHN MERVYN DANIELS Trustee None on record
JUNE EVELYN HARMER Trustee None on record
JANE SPALL Trustee None on record
Janet Susan Ramsden Trustee 20 October 2016 None on record
HEATHER ELIZABETH CAVE Trustee None on record
Gillian Wintle Trustee 05 June 2014 None on record
VALERIE SUSAN WOODS Trustee None on record
VALERIE BRENDA HOWLETT Trustee
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
PATRICIA JOY WALL Trustee 05 January 2012 None on record
Edna Olive Earl Trustee 08 October 2017 None on record
Rosemary Roberts Trustee 20 October 2016 None on record
CHARLES DAVID GEORGE REYNOLDS Trustee
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Rev Louise Elizabeth Morrissey Trustee 22 October 2020
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
CAROL BARBARA SECRET Trustee None on record
ALAN GORDON STEVENS Trustee None on record
BARBARA JOAN BOWLER Trustee None on record
Andrea Lesley Pullum Trustee 07 February 2013 None on record
DANIEL JOHN HOWLETT Trustee
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
PAUL ANTHONY GEE Trustee None on record
JULIAN R D ROGERS Trustee None on record
Rev Peter Gerrard Rayson Chair 22 October 2020
FEN PARK COMMUNITY TRUST Recently registered
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Margaret Ann Oldham Trustee 20 October 2016
DISABLED MOTORING UK Received: On time
LOWESTOFT SHOPMOBILITY Received: On time
DISABILITY ADVICE NORTH EAST SUFFOLK Received: On time
Susan Groome Trustee 07 June 2018
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
YVONNE DANIELS Trustee None on record
MARY READ Trustee 05 January 2012 None on record
JENNY WATSON Trustee None on record
ANS BATES Trustee 21 June 2011 None on record
SALLY ANN REYNOLDS Trustee None on record
Jeanette Soanes Trustee 18 June 2013
LOWESTOFT AND EAST SUFFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Chloe Guy-Pearson Trustee 07 February 2019
SUFFOLK ARTLINK Received: On time