THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. DAVID'S MORETON-IN-MARSH WITH ST. MARY'S BATSFORD

Charity number: 1131097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 March 2021 142 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time Download