PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TONG AND LAISTERDYKE

Charity number: 1130777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £337.02k £321.57k £256.23k £209.83k £194.10k
Total expenditure £392.21k £335.11k £233.23k £227.01k £214.54k
Income from government contracts £51.82k £51.83k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.66k £11.66k £51.83k £29.88k £29.88k