PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TONG AND LAISTERDYKE

Charity number: 1130777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time Download