KENNET AND TEST VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1132306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 10 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download