Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SKEGNESS AND WINTHORPE IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN

Charity number: 1131268
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £119.90k £90.22k £189.41k £102.14k £77.52k
Total expenditure £94.46k £106.81k £144.21k £108.96k £67.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A