Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SKEGNESS AND WINTHORPE IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN

Charity number: 1131268
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 November 2021 375 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 November 2021 375 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 December 2018 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 December 2018 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window