Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LAVANT

Charity number: 1131684
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window