THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY & ST CUTHBERT PARISH CHURCH, CHESTER-LE-STREET

Charity number: 1130847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £462.66k £340.62k £371.66k £351.91k £360.27k
Total expenditure £373.08k £478.79k £531.25k £381.96k £296.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A