THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOPSTON AND ST ANDREW, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1133747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 May 2017 On time Download