Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOPSTON AND ST ANDREW, BRISTOL
Charity number: 1133747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV JAMES CHRISTIAN WILLIAM STEVENSON BA, MPHIL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Daniel Myerscough | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lavinia Auld | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Raymond Hillman | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Anita Pengelley -Scott | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gayle Louise Bryant | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wiliam Bevan | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev WAYNE PHILIP MASSEY | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|||||
JEREMY PETERS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.