THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BISHOPSTON AND ST ANDREW, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1133747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £328.46k £401.74k £376.97k £528.35k £437.89k
Total expenditure £320.70k £357.10k £403.62k £391.79k £379.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £438.11k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £88.06k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £826 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £677 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £680 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £391.79k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A