Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, DOWNEND, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1131689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 21 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window