Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, DOWNEND, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1131689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £282.11k £740.12k £723.47k £400.75k £400.75k
Total expenditure £284.74k £299.22k £298.44k £321.35k £321.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £439.31k £668.40k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £35.11k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £5.42k £35.54k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £3.59k £1.19k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £256.70k £17.70k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £42.00k £1.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £299.22k £298.44k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.04k £2.82k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £19.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A