Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, DOWNEND, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1131689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PAUL PETERSON Chair 02 June 2011
CHURCH PASTORAL AID SOCIETY
Received: On time
Andrew Pound Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Sally Ann Green Trustee 10 April 2019
BROMLEY HEATH SCOUT AND GUIDE HEADQUARTERS
Received: On time
85TH KINGSWOOD (CHRIST CHURCH, DOWNEND) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Margaret Nichols Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Richard Ward Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Eloise Phillips Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Laura Kate Powell Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
BRYAN WILLIAM ASHTON Trustee 26 April 2017
BROMLEY HEATH SCOUT AND GUIDE HEADQUARTERS
Received: On time
JULIAN RICHARD CHARLES COX Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
ROGER CHOLMONDELEY Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
REV CHRISTOPHER DOBSON Trustee 30 June 2011
None on record