Rectorial Benefice of the Glamorgan Heritage Coast PCC

Charity number: 1131490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £188.95k £275.54k £270.09k £355.76k £272.00k
Total expenditure £186.59k £197.29k £352.98k £236.71k £262.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £47.97k £5.11k £8.27k