THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HERSHAM

Charity number: 1131361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £224.45k £224.05k £240.61k £266.56k £373.32k
Total expenditure £231.25k £216.81k £256.80k £269.73k £278.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.50k