Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, EAST GRINSTEAD.

Charity number: 1131405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £255.64k £261.98k £254.24k £203.47k £239.55k
Total expenditure £277.52k £234.18k £237.13k £310.64k £256.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £3.95k £1.52k