THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, SCALBY

Charity number: 1131317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download