THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, SCALBY

Charity number: 1131317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £277.97k £189.21k £191.79k £141.07k £175.55k
Total expenditure £220.11k £229.64k £212.75k £182.14k £213.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.80k £2.82k £2.89k £2.97k £3.02k