THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, PONTELAND

Charity number: 1134771
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £221.32k £214.38k £232.05k £187.60k £156.85k
Total expenditure £216.39k £221.38k £195.07k £216.47k £149.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A