Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER CHIPPENHAM

Charity number: 1131473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 December 2020 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 January 2020 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 January 2020 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window