Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER CHIPPENHAM

Charity number: 1131473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £99.45k £101.84k £104.25k £92.87k £103.30k
Total expenditure £104.53k £99.17k £114.59k £93.48k £96.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.51k £12.53k