STONY STRATFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH, (MEMBER OF THE BAPTIST UNION)

Charity number: 1131785
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £250.37k £315.21k £291.03k £260.72k £238.90k
Total expenditure £153.26k £601.82k £243.71k £194.20k £197.89k