STONY STRATFORD COMMUNITY CHURCH, (MEMBER OF THE BAPTIST UNION)

Charity number: 1131785
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth James BEATON Trustee 29 January 2019 None on record
Dr Neil Hughes Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
Rev Jacqui Green Chair
BRITISH SCHOOL TRUST FUND Charity reporting is up to date
Herman Marais Trustee 19 November 2019 None on record
Rev Stuart Earl Trustee 28 June 2016 None on record
BELINDA GRANT Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record