THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PULBOROUGH

Charity number: 1132137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £185.22k £118.12k £94.64k £92.81k £106.00k
Total expenditure £190.82k £121.94k £93.74k £85.22k £133.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A