THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD

Charity number: 1134798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 December 2018 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 December 2018 32 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 December 2016 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 December 2016 52 days late Download