THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD

Charity number: 1134798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £144.04k £122.67k £108.39k £108.82k £127.17k
Total expenditure £127.45k £127.11k £131.13k £114.09k £155.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.52k £0 £0 N/A N/A