Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S, HURST GREEN, SURREY

Charity number: 1133107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £115.28k £165.49k £135.58k £140.85k £154.76k
Total expenditure £114.69k £150.84k £140.60k £131.50k £149.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.79k £12.13k £5.38k