THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, SPROTBROUGH WITH ST EDMUND, ANCHORAGE LANE

Charity number: 1133069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Christine Hudson Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Barbara Ann Perry Trustee None on record
Marlyn Ann Hopson Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Raymond John Ekins Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Heather Angela Mears Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Roland Lumby Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Rev Robert Heaton Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Alison Lumby Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
Rachel Anne Towers Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Derek Roy Barraclough Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
Rev Amanda Barraclough Trustee 23 July 2015 None on record
James Inglis Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Andrea Susan Offord Trustee 24 March 2019 None on record
Janet Scott Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Therese Martine Paskell Trustee 25 April 2021 None on record
Hilary Downs Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
MISS BETTY BROCKMAN Trustee None on record