THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT ALBAN THE MARTYR, HOLBORN WITH SAINT PETER, SAFFRON HILL

Charity number: 1135568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time Download