THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, RANMOOR, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1135432
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carl Jason Webber Trustee 22 December 2013 None on record
Sarah Beardsmore Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Gaye Woods Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
DAVID FRANCIS BOOKER Trustee 27 April 2014
RANMOOR PARISH CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
FULWOOD EDUCATIONAL ENDOWMENT Received: On time
SHEFFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL EXHIBITION FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE HOUNSFIELD PENSIONS CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST Received: On time
WHIRLOW GRANGE LIMITED Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST Received: On time
CHURCH BURGESSES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
John Green Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Mark Allcock Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
Jacqueline Caryll Dakin Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
BRIAN PARFETT Trustee
RANMOOR PARISH CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
FINANCIAL INCLUSION SERVICES (YORKSHIRE) LTD Received: On time
DAVID WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
Dr Mary Katharine Grover Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record
PETER LOWE Trustee
PHOENIX ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Rev Matthew Ivan Rhodes Trustee 13 September 2018
THE JERUSALEM BISHOPRIC FUND Received: On time
RANMOOR PARISH CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
THE JERUSALEM AND THE MIDDLE EAST CHURCH ASSOCIATION Received: On time
ST MARY'S WAQF Received: On time
Helen Louise Clark Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
ANDREW DAVID CLARK Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
CLAIRE WEBBER Trustee 27 January 2012 None on record
Janet Noble Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Mark Christopher Edward Gregory Trustee 11 October 2020 None on record