Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH, DERBY

Charity number: 1132891
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £294.72k £253.67k £341.87k £265.12k £206.72k
Total expenditure £274.76k £256.95k £318.28k £251.07k £244.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A