Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST PHILIP'S, DORRIDGE WITH ST JAMES', BENTLEY HEATH IN THE BENEFICE OF DORRIDGE AND BENTLEY HEATH

Charity number: 1133831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window